skip to content

Winning, Meredith Kathryn

CPSO#: 95724

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Nov 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Partners in Pregnancy Clinic
Suite 302
170 Simcoe Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 2H7
Phone: (705) 741-1191
Fax: (705) 741-1192 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Peterborough Public Health
185 King St
Peterborough ON  K9J 2R8
Canada
Phone: (705)748-2021
Fax: (705)748-3865
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Winning Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 15 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MEREDITH KATHRYN WINNING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINNING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2013