skip to content

Wine, Stanley Jerold

CPSO#: 22548

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jan 1970
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 1970

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yiddish

Education:University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4430 Bathurst Street
Suite 103
Toronto ON  M3H 3S3
Phone: (416) 638-7226
Fax: (416) 638-0765 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Stanley J. Wine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 6 2020

Medical Records Location

Address: 23 Cheval Drive Toronto, ON M3B1R5
Date Received: 30 Apr 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:20 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STANLEY JEROLD WINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 1970