skip to content

Wilson, William McLeish

CPSO#: 99664

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Melbourne, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 04 Dec 2012 to 14 Feb 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 15 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014