skip to content

Wilson, Stephanie Ruth

CPSO#: 27517

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Stephanie R. Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2007

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Sep 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007