skip to content

Wilson, Roselyn Marie

CPSO#: 101171

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Niagara Mental Health
167 Main St E
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P2 Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 Aug 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROSELYN MARIE WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 29 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 28 Aug 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2018