skip to content

Wilson, Ronald Harold

CPSO#: 20728

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2024
EXPIRY DATE
04 Jun 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 05 Nov 2002

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Patients need to include a phone number where they can be reached.
Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:

FAX: 416.449.0054
PHONE: 416.449.2807 
Date Received: 01 Dec 2003

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:20 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1963 to 14 Jun 1964
Other - Rotating Internship

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1964 to 30 Jun 1965
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1967
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2002
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Nov 2002
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2002
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 11 Nov 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2024

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 21 Aug 2002
Summary:

On August 21, 2002, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found Dr. Ronald Harold Wilson guilty of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and engaged in conduct that members would find disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional in relation to the performance of electroencephalograms on patients using needle electrodes.

The Committee also found Dr. Wilson to be incompetent in his professional care of patients displayed a lack of judgement and disregard for the welfare of his patients of a nature and to an extent that demonstrates that he is unfit to continue in practice or that his paractice should be restricted.

On November 12, 2002, the Discipline ordered that Dr. Wilson's certificate of registration be revoked effective immediately.

Dr. Wilson appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee on December 11, 2002. On November 5, 2003, the Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court) upheld the findings of professional misconduct and incompetence, however, set aside the penalty of revocation.

The Divisional Court substituted the following penalty: a two-year suspension from practising as a neurologist from November 12, 2002, a lifetime ban from acting in the capacity of a medical director and such remedial course(s) as recommended by the College expert, which are recognized by the Canadian and American Neurological Societies.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Decision Altered
Appeal Decision Date: 2003-11-05
Hearing Date(s): Mar 04, 2002