skip to content

Wilson, Robert Charles Duncan

CPSO#: 18919

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1971 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Underserviced Area Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1983