skip to content

Wilson, Nagwa Maurice

CPSO#: 94104

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Jan 2018
EXPIRY DATE
04 Jan 2025
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 05 Jan 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Department of Medical Imaging
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2305 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nagwa Wilson Medicine Professional Corporations
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 17 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Wilson ( CPSO# 94104 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Medical Imaging
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:05 Jan 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Jan 2025

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 04 Dec 2020 Active
 1.    Dr. Nagwa Maurice Wilson may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Diagnostic  Radiology,   University  of Ottawa, in which Dr. Wilson
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank  of  Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  seven  years  from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or  when Dr. Wilson no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Wilson's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment,  professional  conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an annual report or receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about  Dr. Wilson's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on January 5, 2018. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on   January 4, 2025.