skip to content

Wilson, James William Lennox

CPSO#: 32100

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member - CPSO Staff as of 16 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: James W.L. Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 14 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:25 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES WILLIAM LENNOX WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1980