skip to content

Wilson, George Stewart Murchison

CPSO#: 13636

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 1999
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Jun 1999

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 30-May-2011

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1937

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 01 Jan 1952 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1953 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 1951
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 1999