skip to content

Wilson, George Andrew Charles

CPSO#: 26621

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jan 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jan 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. G. A. Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 24 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: HandstheFamilyHelp Network 26 Bill's Drive Bracebridge, ON P1L 1T1 Telephone: 705-645-3155 or 1-800-668-8555 Website: www.HandstheFamilyHelpnetwork.ca
Date Received: 30 Sep 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:19 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2015