skip to content

Willsie, Cheryl Lynn

CPSO#: 91695

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4400
Fax: 519-464-4516 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: C.L. Willsie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Willsie ( CPSO# 91695 )

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHERYL LYNN WILLSIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLSIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 06 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Western University, 07 Jul 2010 to 06 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Western University, 07 Jul 2011 to 06 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Western University, 07 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 06 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Western University, 07 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2014