Willows, Karla Astrid (CPSO#: 99900)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Department of Gynecologic Oncology
699 Concession St
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905)-387-9495
Fax: (905) 575-6343
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARLA ASTRID WILLOWS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLOWS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 21 Feb 2013 to 20 Mar 2013
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 21 Mar 2013 to 17 Apr 2013
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2018