skip to content

Willoughby, Lauren Irene

CPSO#: 98090

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Oct 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 560
2525 Old Bronte Rd
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: 289-386-3636
Fax: 289-386-3536 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. L. Willoughby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Willoughby ( CPSO# 98090 )

Business Address:
2525 Bronte Road
Suite 560
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (289) 386-3636

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAUREN IRENE WILLOUGHBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLOUGHBY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2018