skip to content

Willmore, Andrew

CPSO#: 91260

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 79002 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Andrew Willmore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Willmore ( CPSO# 91260 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 614-1896

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 795-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:29 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW WILLMORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLMORE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 29 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2014