skip to content

Willis, Kenneth Richard

CPSO#: 27890

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 May 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Kenneth R. Willis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: 2005 Hollybrook Crescent, Ottawa, ON K1J 7Y5
Date Received: 04 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:15 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:17 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 02 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016