skip to content

Williams, William Galbraith

CPSO#: 25026

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 08 Apr 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Apr 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Williams-Pannell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 3 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Apr 2019