skip to content

Williams, Robin Lynn

CPSO#: 94797

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Apr 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Apr 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 2100 Stn Main
Saint John Regional Hospital
Saint John NB  E2L 4L2

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Robin Lynn Williams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 24 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:09 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Palliative Medicine Effective:25 Sep 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBIN LYNN WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Aug 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2022