skip to content

Williams, Robert Scott

CPSO#: 27292

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Melbourne, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert Scott Williams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. M. Rasa 65 Dundas St E Paris ON N3L 3H1
Date Received: 23 May 2019

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019