skip to content

Williams, Kenneth John

CPSO#: 31697

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 03 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Jul 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ken Williams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 17 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Sundridge Medical Centre 5 Park Street Sundridge, ON P0A 1Z0
Date Received: 04 Jul 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jul 2018