skip to content

Williams, Heather Catherine

CPSO#: 97758

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jan 2023
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jan 2023

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Division of Neurology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HEATHER CATHERINE WILLIAMS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. WILLIAMS is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. WILLIAMS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. WILLIAMS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. WILLIAMS shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. WILLIAMS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. WILLIAMS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2023.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2023