skip to content

Williams, Eldon Stephen Vernon

CPSO#: 18310

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Sep 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Jun 1962

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 416.781.9083 or 1.888.781.9083 or fax 1.866.297.9338
Instructions: Contact DocuDavit
Date Received: 19 Dec 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:29 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Sep 2013

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 20 Sep 1979
Summary:

 In September 1979, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Williams guilty of professional misconduct, 
 as defined in s. 26(4) of Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, in that he had a conflict of 
 interest.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Williams be fined the sum of $5000.00, and 
 that his licence to practice be suspended for a period of three months.  The Committee further 
 ruled, however, that this suspension would itself be suspended and replaced by the penalty of a 
 reprimand if the Doctor entered into a new lease with his tenant at reasonable rates, and provided 
 proof to the College that this undertaking had been satisfactorily completed by 1 October 1979.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 19 Sep 1979