skip to content

Hu, William

CPSO#: 55447

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Dec 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Health Network
Birchmount Site
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2600 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: William Hu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Hu ( CPSO# 55447 )

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
Grace Division
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 01 Dec 2009

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Hu’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Hu is incompetent and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients. It is also alleged that Dr. Hu engaged in acts or omissions that would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional in respect to his ongoing care and treatment of patients who were also family members and by engaging in inappropriate billing practices, including inappropriately billing the Ontario Health Insurance Plan. It is also alleged that Dr. Hu engaged in sexual abuse of a patient.


Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): May 11, 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 01 Dec 2009 Active
             As from December 1, 2009, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. William Hu, in
            accordance with the undertaking and consent given by Dr. Hu to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  
                  (a)   Dr. Hu's practice is primarily limited to surgical assists and only
                        when a certified surgeon or another qualified physician is
                        performing the surgery and in attendance;
                  
                  (b)   Dr. Hu will limit his clinical practice to his existing patients
                        and will not practice in a clinic or private office setting.