skip to content

Hu, William

CPSO#: 55447

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 21 May 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education: University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: William Hu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Hu ( CPSO# 55447 )

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
Grace Division
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Scarborough General Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 11 May 2021
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 17 May 2021
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 21 May 2021
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 26 May 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2009 Active
 As from May 11, 2021, by order of the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. William Hu:   

(i) 	Dr. Hu will participate in the PROBE Ethics & Boundaries Program offered by the Centre for Personalized Education for Professionals, by receiving a passing evaluation or grade, without any condition or qualification.  Dr. Hu will complete the PROBE program and will provide proof to the College of his completion, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. Dr. Hu shall not return to practice until he has completed the PROBE course.

(ii)	Dr. Hu shall restrict his practice of medicine to surgical assist, and only when a certified surgeon or another qualified physician is performing the surgery and in attendance. Dr. Hu will not be the most responsible physician or provide any continuity of care to surgical patients;

(iii)	This Order replaces and supersedes Dr. Hu's undertaking to the College dated December 1, 2009;

(iv)	Dr. Hu shall consent to the College making enquiries of the Ontario  Health Insurance Plan and/or any person or institution who may have relevant information in order for the College to monitor his compliance with the terms of this Order and shall promptly sign such consents as may be necessary for the College to obtain relevant information from these persons or institutions; and

(v)	Dr. Hu shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any terms of this Order.





Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 11 May 2021
Summary:

On May 11 2021, the Discipline Committee of the College heard, via videoconference, allegations of Dr. Hu’s professional misconduct. In 2009, Dr. Hu had entered into an undertaking with the College in which he agreed to limit his practice primarily to surgical assist. Between 1986 and 2016, Dr. Hu provided care and treatment to 15 members of his immediate and extended family. He kept medical files for all these individuals and billed OHIP for the services he provided.
 
The hearing proceeded in the presence of Dr. Hu and his counsel, and counsel for the College. On the basis of a Statement of Uncontested Facts and Dr. Hu’s plea of no contest, the Committee found that Dr. Hu committed an act of professional misconduct under paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the Medicine Act, 1991, in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regarding to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
 
Disposition
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
 
• Dr. Hu attend before the Committee to be reprimanded;
• The Registrar suspend Dr. Hu’s certificate of registration for 12 months commencing from May 17, 2021 at 12.01 a.m.
• The Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Hu’s certificate of registration, as set out in the order
• Dr. Hu pay costs to the College in the amount of $10,350.
 
On June 3, 2021, the Committee released its reasons for decision and they are available for review on the College’s website.  
 
 


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): May 11, 2021