skip to content

Willer, Ronald Charles

CPSO#: 21532

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 14-Nov-2017

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 495 Huntingdon Drive London, ON N6C 4J2; 641 Commissioners Road East London, ON N6C 2T9 Tel: 519 686 8585
Instructions: Patients seen at the 680 Huron Street location may access their medical records by sending a written request to 495 Huntingdon Drive.
Date Received: 02 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Feb 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014