skip to content

Wilkinson, Sharon Isobel

CPSO#: 29596

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:City Univ N Y Mount Sinai School of Med, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Rheumatology Effective: 03 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019