skip to content

Wilk, Edward Joseph

CPSO#: 19053

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 27 May 1964

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 1-May-2012

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University Of Toronto, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Dr. Wilk Tel: (416) 239-9942
Date Received: 20 Aug 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:01 Jan 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2010