skip to content

Wiley, Alan Murray

CPSO#: 17541

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 14 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Dublin, 1948

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010

Medical Records Location

Address: 49 Elm Avenue Toronto ON M4W 1N6
Date Received: 14 Jun 2017


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 28 Dec 1959 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jun 2017
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.