skip to content

Wildgoose, Petra June

CPSO#: 97685

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 4164806100 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Wildgoose Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Wildgoose ( CPSO# 97685 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jan 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PETRA JUNE WILDGOOSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILDGOOSE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 08 Jan 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 15 Jan 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2018