skip to content

Wilcox, Carol Lynn

CPSO#: 85479

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Sep 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5425 Creditview Road
Unit 8
Mississauga ON  L5V 2P3
Phone: 905-826-1164
Fax: 905 826-1214 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Carol Wilcox Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 24 2020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CAROL LYNN WILCOX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILCOX is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 02 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008