skip to content

Wilansky, Douglas Leo

CPSO#: 21838

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Etobicoke General Hospital Nuclear Medicine 101 Humber College Boulevard Etobicoke, ON M9V 1R8
Instructions: All Internal Medicine clinical records have been destroyed.
Date Received: 08 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1955 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014