skip to content

Wijeyesinghe, Damian Udara Praveen

CPSO#: 94480

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Oct 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Nottingham, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cobourg Clinic
44 University Ave
Cobourg ON  K9A 4K4
Phone: (905) 372-3323 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D.U.P. Wijeyesinghe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wijeyesinghe ( CPSO# 94480 )

Business Address:
Cobourg Clinic
44 University Avenue East
Cobourg ON  K9A 1C8
Phone Number: (905) 372-3323

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:12 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAMIAN UDARA PRAVEEN WIJEYESINGHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIJEYESINGHE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2010 to 09 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Jan 2011 to 17 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2011 to 17 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2012