skip to content

Wignall, Geoffrey Robert

CPSO#: 84754

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Nov 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 209
1101 - 2nd Avenue East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 2J1
Phone: (519) 371-1212
Fax: (833) 297-8964 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Geoffrey R. Wignall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Wignall ( CPSO# 84754 )

Business Address:
Suite 209
1101 2nd Avenue East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 2J1
Phone Number: (519) 371-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GEOFFREY ROBERT WIGNALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIGNALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2006