skip to content

Wigle, William Donald

CPSO#: 13610

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jun 2000
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 9-Aug-2008

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1956 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1951
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1992