skip to content

Wigle, Ronald Denis

CPSO#: 22432

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jan 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jan 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Kingston General Hospital 76 Stuart Street Kingston, ON K7L 2V7 Tel: 613 549 6666
Date Received: 12 Nov 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2016