Wiggers, John Bradley (CPSO#: 100969)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
Positive Care Clinic
300 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5T2
Phone: 905-576-8711 Ext. 3127
Fax: 905-665-2409
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

11 Gibb Street
Glazier Medical Centre
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Canada
Phone: 905-579-1212 Ext. 515
Fax: 289-731-2051
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 27 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN BRADLEY WIGGERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIGGERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 26 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 26 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 27 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017