skip to content

Wierstra, Benjamin Thomas

CPSO#: 89251

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Nov 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 3045 Baseline Rd Neapean ON K2H 8P4 or 201 Georgian Dr Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Date Received: 19 Nov 2018


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta
British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective:08 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:27 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2017 to 17 Dec 2017
EL - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Nov 2018