skip to content

Wiens, Joel Lee

CPSO#: 87020

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jan 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgian Bay General Hospital
Department of Emergeny Medicine
1112 St Andrews Drive PO Box 760
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone: (705) 526-1300 Ext. 1501
Fax: (705) 526-3448 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Joel Wiens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wiens ( CPSO# 87020 )

Business Address:
Georgian Bay General Hospital
Department of Emergeny Medicine
1112 St Andrews Drive PO Box 760
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-1300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOEL LEE WIENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIENS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2010