skip to content

Wielgosz, Andreas Thomas Julian

CPSO#: 27524

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 May 1982
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 May 1982

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:McMaster University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
705 Mackay St
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Pembroke General Hospital
Lorrain Clinic
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Canada
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Wielgosz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wielgosz ( CPSO# 27524 )

Business Address:
Ottawa General Hospital
Suite W1676
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8153

Business Address:
201 Deacon Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 2J6
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - North Carolina

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective:24 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective:10 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREAS THOMAS JULIAN WIELGOSZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIELGOSZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1982