skip to content

Wiebe, Arthur George

CPSO#: 28216

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jun 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Nov 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
755 Bruce Rd 23
Tiverton ON  N0G 2T0
Phone: (519) 396-7518 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Arthur G. Wiebe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wiebe ( CPSO# 28216 )

Business Address:
1201 Queen Street
Kincardine ON  N2Z 3C1
Phone Number: (519) 396-2600

Business Address:
755 Bruce Road 23
Tiverton ON  N0G 2T0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ARTHUR GEORGE WIEBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIEBE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2012