skip to content

Wickramasinghe, Senani Devananda

CPSO#: 27236

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Apr 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Apr 1975

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese

Education:University of Ceylon, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
children's after hours clinic
1100 Sheppard ave E
North York ON  M2K2W1
Phone: 4162505000 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Wickramasinghe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wickramasinghe ( CPSO# 27236 )

Business Address:
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2L 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 250-5000

Business Address:
235 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Phone Number: (416) 461-3000

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1 800 775 0093
Date Received: 14 Aug 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 Mar 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SENANI DEVANANDA WICKRAMASINGHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WICKRAMASINGHE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 1975