skip to content

Wickens, Brandon Ronald

CPSO#: 90655

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Mar 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Mar 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 5
4465 Drummond Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6C5
Phone: (905) 371-0990
Fax: (905) 371-0055 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Wickens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wickens ( CPSO# 90632 )
Dr. B. Wickens ( CPSO# 90655 )

Business Address:
1338 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0G1
Phone Number: (905) 984-3335

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRANDON RONALD WICKENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WICKENS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2015