skip to content

Whitten-Stovall, Richard Frank

CPSO#: 92734

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Emory University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Albany Medical Clinic
Department of Psychiatry
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone: (416) 461-9471 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - North Dakota

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:01 Jun 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2013 Active
             Dr.  Richard  Frank  Whitten-Stovall  may  practise  medicine  independently in
            psychiatry, only.