skip to content

Whitney, Robyn Nicole

CPSO#: 92839

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 May 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Division of Paediatric Neurology
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton, Ontario L8N 3Z5
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: 905 521 2100 Ext. 75393
Fax: (905) 521-7914 Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBYN NICOLE WHITNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITNEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Paediatric Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 2017