skip to content

Whitman, Rodger Austin

CPSO#: 12725

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 30-Jan-2004

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1948

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1948
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Oct 1992
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.