skip to content

Whiteman, Gabriel

CPSO#: 13699

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jun 2000
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Jun 2000

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1947

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Dec 1952 RCPSC Specialist
Radiation Oncology Effective: 01 Dec 1952 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1951 to 30 Jun 1952
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1952
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Oct 1960
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Oct 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 2000