skip to content

Whitehead, Ingrid Natalie

CPSO#: 93753

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
715 Coronation Blvd- Suite 3
Cambridge ON  N1R 7R1
Phone: (519) 621-9494
Fax: (519) 658-0580 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ingrid Radovanovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Whitehead ( CPSO# 93753 )

Business Address:
202-182 Pinebush Rd
Cambridge ON  N1R 8J8
Phone Number: 519-621-9494

Business Address:
715 Coronation Boulevard
Suite 3
Cambridge ON  N1R 7R1
Phone Number: (519) 622-8715

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients should forward requests for medical records to the following email address: [email protected]
Date Received: 05 Oct 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. INGRID NATALIE WHITEHEAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITEHEAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
AVP - Orthopedic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2015