skip to content

Whitehead, Edward

CPSO#: 19229

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Sep 1994
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jan 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Sep 1994