skip to content

White, Nicholas Merson

CPSO#: 41874

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2005
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.