skip to content

White, David Geoffrey Benjamin

CPSO#: 98405

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
460 West Hunt Club Suite 106
Ottawa ON  K2E0B8
Phone: (613) 820-3694 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Optimize Physio & Sport Medicine
3771 Spratt Road
Ottawa ON  K1V 2P3
Canada
Phone: 613-425-4213
Fax: 613-425-4215
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David G.B. White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. White ( CPSO# 98405 )

Business Address:
460 West Hunt Club
Suite 106
Ottawa ON  K2E 0B8
Phone Number: (613) 820-3694

Business Address:
Optimize Phsyio & Sport Medicine
4 - 3771 Spratt Road
Ottawa ON  K1V 2P3
Phone Number: (613) 425-4213

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID GEOFFREY BENJAMIN WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2015